Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/05/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/05/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/06/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/14/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/14/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/14/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/15/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/15/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/20/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/20/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/20/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/20/2013