Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 02/15/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/06/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/06/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/06/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/14/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 03/14/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/15/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/15/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/19/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 03/19/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/19/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/20/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/20/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/20/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/20/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/20/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/20/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/20/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23] 03/20/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/20/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/20/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/20/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 03/20/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/20/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/20/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/20/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/20/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/20/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 03/20/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/20/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/20/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/20/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/20/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/20/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/20/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/20/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/20/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/20/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 03/20/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/20/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 03/20/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/20/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/20/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/20/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 03/20/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 03/20/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/20/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 03/20/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 03/20/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 03/20/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 03/20/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/09/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/23/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/23/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/23/2013