Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 01/07/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 01/14/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 01/21/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/31/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 01/31/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/04/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/04/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/21/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/28/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/02/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/02/2014