Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 01/07/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 01/07/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 01/07/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 01/21/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 01/31/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 02/21/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/11/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 03/24/2014