Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 01/21/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 01/21/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 01/31/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 02/21/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/21/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 03/05/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/24/2014