Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 01/28/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/31/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 03/06/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/11/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/13/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/13/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 03/24/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/24/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/27/2014