Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/26/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/26/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 02/26/2014
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34] 02/26/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/26/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/26/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 03/27/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/04/2014