Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 12/11/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 01/15/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/15/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/27/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/02/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 04/08/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/08/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/08/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/08/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/09/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/09/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/09/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/10/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/28/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/28/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 04/28/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/28/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/28/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/29/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/30/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 04/30/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/30/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 04/30/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 05/01/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/01/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/01/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/01/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/06/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/06/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/07/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/07/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/08/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/08/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/08/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/08/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/09/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 05/09/2014