Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/20/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/20/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/09/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/16/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/24/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/03/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/13/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 05/13/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/06/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 06/06/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 08/01/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 09/12/2013