Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 11/22/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 11/22/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 11/22/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 11/22/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/08/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 02/03/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 02/27/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/06/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/06/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 03/11/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 03/24/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/24/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/11/2014