Refine your search

8 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
05/20/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-104.
05/20/2014 Signed by President.
05/12/2014 Presented to President.
05/07/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
05/07/2014 Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2823)
12/09/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7570)
12/09/2013 Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-286.
12/02/2013 Introduced in House