Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 12/02/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 12/02/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 12/02/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 12/02/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 12/03/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 12/03/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 12/05/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 12/05/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/25/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/27/2014