There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Health Care Providers from Increased Administrative Burdens Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To clarify that certain recipients of payments from the Federal Government related to the delivery of health care services to individuals shall not be treated as Federal contractors by the Office of Federal Contract Compliance Programs based on the work performed or actions taken by such individuals that resulted in the receipt of such payments.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/03/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/13/2014Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Workforce Protections
01/22/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
12/03/2013Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/03/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/08/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 01/09/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/10/2014
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/04/2013 03/12/2014 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce12/03/2013 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Workforce Protections01/22/2014 Referred to
03/13/2014 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.3633.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3633. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/03/2013)

Protecting Health Care Providers from Increased Administrative Burdens Act - Prohibits a state or local government or other entity that receives a payment from the federal government related to the delivery of health care services to individuals, whether or not such individuals are or have been employed by the federal government, from being treated as a federal contractor or subcontractor by the Office of Federal Contract Compliance Programs based on the work performed or actions taken by such individuals that resulted in the receipt of such payment.