Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 01/08/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/09/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/09/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/09/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/14/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 01/14/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/28/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 01/29/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 02/05/2014