Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 01/08/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 01/09/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/14/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 01/27/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/29/2014