Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/10/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 01/13/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/15/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/29/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/03/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/29/2014