Refine your search

Refined by:

Oklahoma Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/08/2014
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 01/09/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 01/10/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 01/13/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 01/14/2014