Refine your search

Refined by:

Virginia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 01/28/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/29/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/27/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/12/2014