Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/08/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/08/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/08/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/08/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/08/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 01/08/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/08/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 01/08/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/08/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 01/08/2014
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/08/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 01/09/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 01/09/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 01/09/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 01/09/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/09/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 01/09/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 01/09/2014
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 01/09/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/09/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/09/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 01/09/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 01/09/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 01/09/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 01/09/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/09/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 01/10/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 01/10/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 01/10/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 01/10/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/10/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 01/10/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 01/13/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 01/13/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 01/13/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 01/13/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 01/13/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 01/13/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 01/14/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/14/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 01/14/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/14/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/14/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/14/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 01/14/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/14/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/14/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 01/14/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 01/14/2014
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 01/14/2014
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 01/14/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/14/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/15/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 01/15/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 01/15/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/15/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/15/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/15/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 01/15/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 01/15/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 01/15/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/15/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 01/27/2014
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/27/2014
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/27/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 01/27/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 01/27/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 01/27/2014
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 01/28/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/28/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 01/28/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 01/29/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 01/29/2014
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/29/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/29/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/29/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/29/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/29/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/29/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 01/29/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 01/29/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/29/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/29/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/29/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 01/29/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/03/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/03/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/03/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 02/05/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/05/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/05/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/05/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/05/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 02/05/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 02/10/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 02/10/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/11/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/27/2014
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/04/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/12/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/29/2014