Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/08/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/08/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/25/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/28/2014