Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/07/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/14/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/31/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/05/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/05/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/18/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 03/06/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 03/21/2014