Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 12/11/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/07/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/15/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/10/2014