Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/25/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 01/29/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/11/2013