Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 01/25/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/25/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/04/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/15/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/05/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/07/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/16/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/12/2013