Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/11/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/28/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/01/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 12/04/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/11/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 12/11/2014