Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 01/21/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/25/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/10/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/08/2014