Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 12/05/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/10/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 01/21/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/27/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/27/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/05/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/10/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 02/14/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/25/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/25/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 02/27/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/28/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/28/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/06/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/14/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/14/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/26/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/27/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/27/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/01/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/01/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/01/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/04/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/04/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/10/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 05/01/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/01/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/10/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/08/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/10/2014