Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/11/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/11/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/11/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/11/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/11/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/11/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/11/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 12/11/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 12/11/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 12/11/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 12/11/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 12/11/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 12/11/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 12/11/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 12/11/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/11/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/11/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 12/11/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/19/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 12/19/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/19/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 12/19/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/19/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/16/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/11/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/11/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/22/2014