Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 12/09/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 02/26/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/10/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/10/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/10/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/10/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/10/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/10/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/10/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/10/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 06/10/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/10/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/10/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/10/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/10/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/10/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/10/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 06/10/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/10/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/10/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/10/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/10/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 06/10/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/10/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/10/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/10/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/10/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/10/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/10/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/10/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/10/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 06/10/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/10/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 06/10/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/10/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 06/10/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/10/2014
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/10/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/10/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/10/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 06/10/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/10/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/10/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/10/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/10/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/10/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/10/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 06/10/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/10/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/10/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/10/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/10/2014
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 06/10/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/10/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/10/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/10/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 06/10/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/10/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/10/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/10/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/10/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/10/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/10/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/10/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/10/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 06/10/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 06/10/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/10/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/10/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 06/10/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/10/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/10/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/10/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/10/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/10/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/10/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/10/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/10/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/10/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 06/10/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/10/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/10/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/10/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 06/10/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/10/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 06/10/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/10/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/10/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/10/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/10/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/10/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/10/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/10/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/10/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/10/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/10/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/10/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/10/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/10/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/10/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/10/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/10/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/10/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/10/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/10/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/12/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 06/12/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/12/2014
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 06/12/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/12/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/17/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/17/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/17/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/17/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/24/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 06/24/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 06/24/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/24/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/24/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/24/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/24/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/24/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/24/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/24/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 06/24/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/24/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/24/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/24/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/25/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/25/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/25/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/25/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/15/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/15/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/15/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/17/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/17/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/23/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/23/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/23/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/23/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/23/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/23/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/23/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/23/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 07/23/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/23/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/23/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/23/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 07/23/2014
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/23/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/23/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/23/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/23/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 07/23/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/23/2014
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/23/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/24/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/24/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/24/2014
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 07/24/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 07/24/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/24/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/24/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/24/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/24/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/24/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 07/25/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/25/2014
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 07/25/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 07/30/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 08/01/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 08/01/2014
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 08/01/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 09/09/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 09/11/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/17/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 09/17/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/17/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/17/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 09/17/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/17/2014
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/17/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/17/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/17/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 09/17/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 09/17/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 09/17/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/17/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 09/17/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 09/17/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/17/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 09/17/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/12/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 11/12/2014