Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 12/09/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 12/09/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 12/09/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/27/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/23/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 06/25/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 07/24/2014