Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
12/16/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-217. (TXT | PDF)
12/16/2014 Signed by President.
12/08/2014 Presented to President.
12/03/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/03/2014 Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6305)
06/17/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5387)
12/09/2013 Introduced in House