Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 12/12/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/09/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/09/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 01/09/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 03/13/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 03/18/2014