There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Military LAND Act
Military Land and National Defense Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Military LAND Act
Military Land and National Defense Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Historic Preservation Act to provide that if the head of the agency managing Federal property objects to the inclusion of certain property on the National Register or its designation as a National Historic Landmark for reasons of national security, the Federal property shall be neither included nor designated until the objection is withdrawn, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/30/2014Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-503.
12/10/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
06/30/2014Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 376.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/30/2014Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-503.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/08/2014Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 12.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/08/2014Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/08/2014Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/29/2014Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation
12/13/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/10/2013Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/10/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources12/10/2013 Referred to
05/08/2014 Markup by
06/30/2014 Reported by H. Rept. 113-503
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation12/13/2013 Referred to
04/29/2014 Hearings by
05/08/2014 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3687. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (06/30/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Military Land and National Defense Act or the Military LAND Act - Amends the National Historic Preservation Act to require the Secretary of the Interior to notify the House Committee on Natural Resources and the Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources if a property owned by the federal government is being considered for inclusion on the National Register of Historic Places, for designation as a National Historic Landmark, or for nomination to the World Heritage List. Prohibits such inclusion or designation of federal property if the head of any federal agency managing such property objects to such inclusion or designation for national security reasons, such as any impact the inclusion or designation of such property would have on use of the property for military training or readiness.

Requires the Secretary to promulgate regulations to allow for expedited removal of a federal property listed on the National Register of Historic Places if the managing agency of such property submits a written request to remove the property for national security reasons.