Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 12/10/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/14/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/14/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/14/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 05/19/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/08/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/31/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/31/2014