Refine your search

Showing 21 of 21 total for All Actions.
Date Chamber All Actions
07/29/2014 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
07/28/2014-5:16pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2014-5:16pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6909-6915)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2014-4:40pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3696.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2014-4:40pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6908-6922)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2014-4:39pm House Mr. McCaul moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
07/23/2014 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 411.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: House of Representatives
07/23/2014 House Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
Type of Action: Committee Discharge
Action By: House of Representatives
07/23/2014 House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology discharged.
Type of Action: Committee Discharge
Action By: House of Representatives
07/23/2014 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 113-550, Part I.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Homeland Security
02/05/2014 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Homeland Security
02/05/2014 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Homeland Security
01/15/2014 House Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies
01/15/2014 House Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies
01/08/2014 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Science, Space, and Technology
01/07/2014 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Homeland Security
12/11/2013 House Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
12/11/2013 House Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
12/11/2013 House Referred to House Homeland Security
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
12/11/2013 House Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
12/11/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives