Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 01/31/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/31/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/31/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/05/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 02/21/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 02/21/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 02/21/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 06/11/2014