Refine your search

Refined by:

Minnesota Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/31/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/05/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/20/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/02/2014