Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/12/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 01/31/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/06/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/13/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/06/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/14/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/17/2014