Refine your search

Refined by:

Washington Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/28/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/27/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/13/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/05/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 09/16/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/12/2014