Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 12/23/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 12/23/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 12/23/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 12/23/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/23/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 12/23/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 12/23/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 01/08/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/08/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 01/08/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 01/08/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 01/08/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 01/08/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 01/08/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 01/13/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/13/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 01/13/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 01/13/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 01/13/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 01/21/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/21/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 01/21/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 01/21/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/31/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 01/31/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/31/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 01/31/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/31/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/31/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 01/31/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/31/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/31/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/31/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/31/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 01/31/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/31/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/31/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 01/31/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 01/31/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/05/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/05/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/05/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/05/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 02/21/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 02/21/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/21/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/27/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 03/06/2014
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/11/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/12/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/21/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/21/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/25/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/08/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/06/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/06/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/13/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/13/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/19/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/20/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/20/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/02/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/05/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 06/11/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/26/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 09/08/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 09/08/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 09/16/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/19/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/12/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/12/2014