Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/12/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 12/23/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 12/23/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 12/23/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 12/23/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 12/23/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 12/23/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 12/23/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 01/07/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 01/07/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 01/08/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/13/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 01/13/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/13/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 01/13/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/13/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 01/14/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 01/21/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 01/21/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/21/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 01/31/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 01/31/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/31/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 01/31/2014
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/31/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/31/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/31/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/31/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/31/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/31/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 01/31/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/05/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/05/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/10/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 02/10/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 02/21/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/21/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/21/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/21/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 02/21/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/26/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/28/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/05/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/06/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/11/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/12/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/13/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/21/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/27/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/03/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/03/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/06/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/06/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 05/08/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 05/20/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/20/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 06/05/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/17/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/14/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/17/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/24/2014