There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure the emergency protection of Iranian dissidents living in Camp Liberty/Hurriya and to provide for their admission as refugees to the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/11/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
01/27/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
12/11/2013Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/11/2013Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/11/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (64)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 12/11/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/15/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/15/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/15/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/15/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/21/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 02/06/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 02/06/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/06/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/06/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 02/06/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/06/2014
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/06/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/06/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/06/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/10/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/26/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/26/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/26/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/26/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/26/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 03/18/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/18/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/18/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/10/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/10/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/30/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/30/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/30/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/06/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 05/06/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/06/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/06/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/21/2014
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 05/21/2014
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 05/28/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/09/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 06/11/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs12/11/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary12/11/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security01/27/2014 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3707.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3707. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/11/2013)

Directs the United States to: (1) take all necessary and appropriate steps to ensure the safety of the residents of Camp Liberty/Hurriya in Iraq; (2) provide all necessary and appropriate assistance to the United Nations (U.N.) High Commissioner for Refugees to process refugee applications by the residents of Camp Liberty/Hurriya and to secure their safe resettlement outside of Iraq; and (3) admit the residents of Camp Liberty/Hurriya as refugees in the United States and not delay or bar such resettlement because any such resident is or has been a member of, or supports or has supported, organizations or groups that were subject to the Secretary of State's decision of September 21, 2012.

Directs the Secretary and the Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to report to Congress on U.S. efforts to guard the safety of Camp Liberty/Hurriya residents and secure their orderly resettlement.