Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 12/12/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 12/12/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/16/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 12/23/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 12/23/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/23/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 12/23/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/23/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/23/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/07/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/07/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/09/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/09/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 01/09/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 01/13/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/13/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/13/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/15/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/21/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 01/21/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/27/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 01/27/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 01/27/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 02/05/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/05/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/05/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 02/05/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 02/14/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/14/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 02/14/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 02/14/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/18/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/25/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 02/26/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 02/26/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/26/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/04/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 03/04/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 03/05/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 03/05/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/10/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/11/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 03/11/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 03/12/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/12/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/12/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/12/2014
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 03/12/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/12/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 03/12/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/12/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/18/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/18/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/21/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 03/21/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/21/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 03/24/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 03/24/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/26/2014
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 03/26/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 03/27/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/27/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/02/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/02/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/02/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/03/2014
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/04/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/04/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/08/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/08/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/08/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 04/28/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/28/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/28/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/30/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/01/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/06/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/06/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/08/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/08/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/15/2014
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/15/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/15/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/15/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 05/19/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 05/22/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/22/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/27/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 05/29/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/02/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/11/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 06/11/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/12/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/18/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/24/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 06/30/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 07/10/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/22/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/23/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/25/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/30/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/30/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/31/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 07/31/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/08/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/08/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/08/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 09/08/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/08/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/09/2014
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 09/09/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 09/09/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/11/2014
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/11/2014
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19] 09/11/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/15/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 09/16/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 09/16/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 09/17/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 09/18/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 09/18/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 09/18/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/18/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/18/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 09/18/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/12/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 11/12/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/12/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 11/12/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/12/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/12/2014
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 11/12/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 11/13/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 11/18/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 11/19/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/02/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/09/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/11/2014