Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/06/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/26/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/26/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 02/26/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/18/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/26/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/08/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/08/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/18/2014