Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/11/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 01/13/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/13/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 01/13/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/13/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/13/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 01/13/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/13/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/13/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 02/03/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/25/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/09/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 07/30/2014