There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Family and Medical Insurance Leave Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide paid family and medical leave benefits to certain individuals, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/12/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
12/12/2013Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/12/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (101)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 12/12/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 12/12/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 01/07/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 01/07/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 01/07/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 01/09/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 01/09/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 01/09/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 01/09/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 01/15/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/27/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 01/31/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/31/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/06/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 02/06/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/06/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/06/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 02/06/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 02/10/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 02/10/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/11/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 02/11/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 02/14/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/14/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/14/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 02/14/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 02/14/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/21/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/21/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/21/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 02/27/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/11/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 03/24/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/25/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/25/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/04/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 04/09/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 04/28/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/28/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 04/29/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/19/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/24/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/08/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/29/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/31/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 07/31/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/08/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/08/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/09/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/10/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/16/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/13/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means12/12/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3712. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/12/2013)

Family and Medical Insurance Leave Act of 2013 - Establishes the Office of Paid Family and Medical Leave within the Social Security Administration (SSA), to be headed by the Deputy Commissioner of SSA.

Entitles every individual to a family and medical leave insurance (FMLI) benefit payment for each month beginning on the first day of the first month in which the individual meets the criteria specified below and ending 365 days later (benefit period), not to exceed 60 qualified caregiving days per period. Qualifies for such a benefit payment any individual who:

  1. is insured for disability insurance benefits under the Social Security Act at the time his or her application is filed;
  2. has earned income from employment during the 12 months before filing it;
  3. has filed an application for a FMLI benefit in accordance with this Act; and
  4. was engaged in qualified caregiving, or anticipates being so engaged, during the 90-day period before the application is filed or within 30 days after.

Defines "qualified caregiving" as any activity engaged in by an individual, other than regular employment, for a reason for which an eligible employee would be entitled to leave under the Family and Medical Leave Act of 1993 (FMLA).

Prescribes a formula for determination of an individual's monthly FMLI benefit payment, as well as for the maximum and the minimum monthly benefit amounts.

Requires a FMLI benefit payment to be coordinated with any periodic benefits received from temporary disability insurance or family leave insurance programs under any state law or plan, local government, or an instrumentality of two or more states.

Prescribes criteria that makes an individual ineligible for a FMLI benefit payment.

Specifies prohibited acts by an employer, and penalties for violations.

Establishes the Federal Family and Medical Leave Insurance Trust Fund in the Treasury. Requires FMLI benefit payments to be made only from this Fund.

Prohibits the use of amounts from the Social Security Trust Fund or appropriated to the SSA to administer Social Security programs for FMLI benefits or administration.

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to impose a tax on every individual and employer, all self-employment income, and every railroad employee, employee representative, or railroad employer to finance the Federal Family and Medical Leave Insurance Trust Fund in the Treasury for FMLI benefits.