Refine your search

Refined by:

Massachusetts Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 01/09/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/28/2014