Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 01/07/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 01/07/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 01/09/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 01/09/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/06/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 02/10/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 02/14/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 02/14/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 02/27/2014