Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 12/12/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 12/12/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 01/07/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 01/07/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 01/07/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 01/09/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 01/09/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 01/09/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 01/09/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 01/15/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/27/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 01/31/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/31/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/06/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 02/06/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/06/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/06/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 02/06/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 02/10/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 02/10/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/11/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 02/11/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 02/14/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/14/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/14/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 02/14/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 02/14/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/21/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/21/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/21/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 02/27/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/11/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 03/24/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/25/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/25/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/04/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 04/09/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 04/28/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/28/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 04/29/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/19/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/24/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/08/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/29/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/31/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 07/31/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/08/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/08/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/09/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/10/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/16/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/13/2014