Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/16/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/16/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 12/16/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/16/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/03/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/03/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 01/03/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/08/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 01/08/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 01/08/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/08/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 01/08/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 01/09/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/09/2014
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 01/09/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 01/09/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/09/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 01/13/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 01/13/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/14/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/15/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/15/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 01/16/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/16/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/27/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 01/29/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/29/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/03/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/05/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 02/10/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/06/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 03/06/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/11/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 03/14/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/14/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/14/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 03/24/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 03/27/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 03/27/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/27/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/27/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/27/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/28/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/01/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/02/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/04/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/07/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/08/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 04/08/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 04/08/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/09/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 04/09/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/10/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/10/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/29/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/29/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/30/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/06/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/09/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/13/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/20/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/20/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/20/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/20/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/21/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 05/22/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/28/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/30/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/05/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/11/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/23/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/03/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/08/2014
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 07/10/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/23/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/24/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/30/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/31/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 07/31/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/09/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 09/09/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 09/09/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/10/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 09/17/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/18/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/18/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 09/18/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/18/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/18/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 09/18/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 09/18/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/12/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 11/14/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/17/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 11/18/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/20/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 12/04/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 12/10/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew